Financial history DERWENT RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity number: 513341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 30/08/2023 30/08/2024
Total gross income £15.20k £4.79k £5.17k £3.51k £5.00k
Total expenditure £8.05k £5.77k £6.43k £5.09k £8.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A