THE SALEEM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Saleem Foundation will support charities and voluntary organisations across Birmingham & Black Country who undertake charitable work in the fields of health, disability, financial hardship or other, and will also support individuals and their families who are disadvantaged by their youth, age, ill-health, disability or financial hardship and will take the form of grant aid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 29 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WALTHO MBE | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Louise Stokes | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cassie Helena Gray | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saima Ghalib | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Wilcox | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Darby | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dalbir Kaur | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Waltho | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.97k | £13.93k | £28.04k | £26.63k | £11.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.69k | £4.91k | £41.44k | £35.15k | £11.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £4.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
234 DUDLEY ROAD
HALESOWEN
B63 3LW
- Phone:
- 07786196666
- Email:
- saleemfoundation@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window