THE COOMBE WOOD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through its charitable activities the CWSA will raise funds and access support from business and individuals to benefit the CWS community through the provision of items and opportunities that will develop CWS students across all age groups and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Croydon
Governance
- 12 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abigail Michael | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Murray | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.06k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £2.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 523 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 523 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 888 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 888 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Mar 2019 as amended on 02 Mar 2021 as amended on 04 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 MELVILLE AVENUE
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 7HY
- Phone:
- 02082894745
- Email:
- enquiries@cws-croydon.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window