CIRCULARITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Designing, delivering, learning from, and disseminating the learning from workshops, conferences, seminars, lectures and research associated with the circular economy and related topics such as sustainability and prudent resource use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 September 2019: CIO registration
- THE CIRCULARITY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Richard Hammond | Chair | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Kushner Dowen | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MURDO MACLEOD WEBB PHD | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Roy Pitcairn | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £0 | £19.88k | £19.74k | £5.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £84 | £10.27k | £5.82k | £5.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE CIRCULAR ECONOMY* AND RELATED TOPICS OF SUSTAINABLE AND PRUDENT RESOURCE USE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH WORKSHOPS, CONFERENCES, SEMINARS, LECTURES AND UNDERTAKING AND DISSEMINATING RESEARCH. * FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE THE CIRCULAR ECONOMY MEANS AN ALTERNATIVE TO THE TRADITIONAL LINEAR ECONOMY (‘MAKE, USE, DISPOSE’) WHERE RESOURCES ARE KEPT IN USE FOR AS LONG AS POSSIBLE, WITH THE MAXIMUM VALUE EXTRACTED WHILST IN USE, AND PRODUCTS AND MATERIALS RECOVERED AND REGENERATED AT THE END OF EACH SERVICE LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 The Birchlands
Forest Town
Mansfield
NG19 0ER
- Phone:
- 01623640134
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window