BLACKBURN MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Musical Comedy Productions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 10 January 1983: Standard registration
- THE BLACKBURN AMATEURS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY HUGHES WORTHY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Cottam | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Terry | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Robins | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Hunt | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNA CRYER | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOAN SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORNA SLINGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY STANFORD FRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PETER HEATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA BROMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.41k | £154 | £24.90k | £28.16k | £34.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £2.10k | £26.29k | £25.82k | £28.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS,TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS,TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 ST. MARTINS DRIVE
BLACKBURN
BB2 5HU
- Phone:
- 01254208950
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
bmtcmusicals.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window