CYMDEITHAS HANES TEULUOEDD DYFED/DYFED FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society encourages and assists people worldwide who are researching family or general history related to Dyfed (Cardiganshire, Carmarthenshire, and Pembrokeshire). A journal about people, places and social history is published. There are branches in Cardigan, Carmarthen, Haverfordwest, Llandovery, Llanelli and London, each with a programme of meetings to educate or to help with research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Austria
- Bermuda
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Japan
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 10 December 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Davies | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID SKYRME | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Davina Price | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Wyn Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cate Hobbs | Trustee | 14 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Colin Potter | Trustee | 15 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANICE HUGHES | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
GERAINT CHRISTOPHER JOHN DAVIES | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNA CHRISTINA BRUETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.47k | £15.71k | £13.39k | £15.08k | £16.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.70k | £11.80k | £13.18k | £14.95k | £19.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/05/1982 AS AMENDED ON 08/01/1983 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/1984 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/1991 AS AMENDED ON 20/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2011 as amended on 06 Apr 2019 as amended on 17 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THE STUDY OF GENEALOGY, HERALDRY, FAMILY HISTORY AND LOCAL HISTORY IN THE COUNTY OF DYFED. (FOR FUTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF DYFED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Milton Meadows
Milton
Tenby
SA70 8PL
- Phone:
- 01646650250
- Email:
- secretary@dyfedfhs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window