COR MEIBION DE CYMRU - THE SOUTH WALES MALE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds for children's hospital, special needs school, air ambulance, research into altzeimer's, cancer and other charitable fund raisers eg rotary, mcmillan nurses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Canada
- Czech Republic
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Hungary
- Norway
- Poland
- Russia
- Spain
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 10 January 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY SMALLBONE | Chair | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bob Lewis | Trustee | 04 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guy Edwards OBE | Trustee | 04 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael McGivern | Trustee | 04 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER EDKINS | Trustee | 04 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hayes | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
GARETH HUW DAVIES | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|||||
PETER OLIVER | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN POWELL | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER EVANS | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEFF JAMES | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
GWYNLAIS PHILLIPS | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|||||
David Stewart-Walvin | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.85k | £9.06k | £9.62k | £89.21k | £88.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.00k | £13.43k | £19.82k | £107.37k | £80.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 7 NOVEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED 29 APRIL 1984, 14 JUNE 1987, 26 JUNE 1988, 5 JANUARY 1992, 28 JUNE 1992, 7 NOVEMBER 1993, 12 JUNE 1994 AND 4 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES RELATING TO THE PRACTICE, PRESENTATION AND STUDY OF MUSIC, IN ORDER, INTER ALIA TO PROMOTE BETTER AND MORE WIDE-SPREAD PERFORMANCE OF MALE CHORAL WORK, BOTH INSIDE AND IN PARTICULAR OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM, AND FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF GOOD UNDERSTANDING AND INTERNATIONAL CO-OPERATION IN CHORAL WORK BETWEEN SIMILAR FOREIGN CHOIRS AND COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 TOCKENHAM CORNER
TOCKENHAM
SWINDON
SN4 7PF
- Phone:
- 07866924912
- Email:
- pjh1950@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window