Accounts and annual returns BEVERLEY WESTWOOD LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1181420
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 July 2024 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 10 July 2024 71 days late
Annual return 30 June 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 15 February 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 March 2021 On Time