THE CINQUEFOIL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) provide grants to registered charities and b) the relief of financial hardship amongst serving and former members of the Security Service, the dependants of any such member and in a family relationship with any such member.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

No information available
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 2019: CIO registration
- 08 January 2020: Funds received from 1157310 THE CINQUEFOIL TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.03m | £131.23k | £212.75k | £516.20k | £538.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.73k | £202.79k | £320.16k | £380.49k | £374.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £15.68m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £339.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £1.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £15.67m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £173.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.50m | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.10m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | £438.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | £22.72k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO APPLY ITS INCOME AND CAPITAL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION: (A) FOR THE PROVISION GRANTS TO REGISTERED CHARITIES (B) FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE SECURITY SERVICE (MI5) THROUGH THE RELIEF OF NEED (BY REASON OF HEALTH, DISABILITY, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR DISADVANTAGE) AMONGST SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS, THEIR DEPENDANTS AND THOSE IN A FAMILY RELATIONSHIP WITH SUCH MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS, AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO ENHANCE THEIR MORALE AND WELL BEING
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CORRESPONDENT
P O BOX 3255
LONDON
SW1P 1AE
- Phone:
- 02079309000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window