THE HUDDERSFIELD AFRICAN CARIBBEAN CULTURAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activity is the delivery of creative workshops for children and young people to learn new skills, share experiences and reduces social isolation. The workshop activities contribute to an annual Huddersfield Carnival which brings together the community, Families can enjoy being entertained by local talent and performances whilst indulging in a variety of Caribbean delicacies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £34,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
Governance
- 24 February 2020: CIO registration
- 12 December 2022: Funds received from 1129873 THE HUDDERSFIELD AFRICAN CARIBBEAN CULTRUAL TRUST
- HACCT (Working name)
- THE HUDDERSFIELD AFRICAN CARIBBEAN CULTRUAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chantell Grant | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Dennis | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tia Pinnock-Hamilton | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Paul | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Welch | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARA DEARNLEY | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin Buckle | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lillalee Wright | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Devonport | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £37.77k | £18.53k | £112.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.77k | £25.36k | £108.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.00k | £34.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 October 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 04 October 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 November 2022 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP APPRECIATION OF AND PARTICIPATION IN AFRICAN – CARIBBEAN ARTS AND CULTURE INCLUDING CARNIVAL AND STREET ARTS, THEIR TRADITIONS, MUSIC AND CRAFTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ARTS WORKSHOPS, ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR AND BY THE PROMOTION AND ORGANISATION OF AN ANNUAL CARNIVAL IN HUDDERSFIELD. 2) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HUDDERSFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, DISABILITY, AGE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 3) TO ADVANCE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN HUDDERSFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FUNDING TO LOCAL CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 28
Gatehouse Enterprise Centre
Albert Street
HUDDERSFIELD
- Phone:
- 07961189281
- Email:
- hacctrust@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window