MARANATA ROMANIAN PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Brent
- Harrow
- Romania
Governance
- 25 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Costel Motac | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Neculai Toader | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Stefan Pascariu | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ioan-Honorius Flore | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 529 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 529 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 894 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 894 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1259 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1259 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1624 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1624 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
306 DOLLIS HILL LANE
LONDON
NW2 6HH
- Phone:
- 07540633706
- Email:
- motacus00@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window