Accounts and annual returns RESCUE RANCH UK

Charity number: 1183565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 14 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 14 November 2024 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 14 November 2024 228 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 21 April 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 21 April 2023 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 01 November 2020 On Time