Financial history RESCUE RANCH UK

Charity number: 1183565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £6.76k £23.46k £14.58k £22.25k £2.21k
Total expenditure £6.02k £18.63k £18.66k £8.86k £2.88k
Income from government contracts £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A