ROYAL AIR FORCE SPORTS PARACHUTE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Development of Sports Parachuting. 2. Development of Competitive Parachuting. 3. Provide support and financial benefit to associated service charities. 4. Income generation through delivery of parachuting to support RAFSPA and other agencies. 5. Promote the RAF, increase morale, esprit de corps and physical fitness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 April 2019: CIO registration
- RAF SKYDIVING (Working name)
- RAF SPORTS PARA (Working name)
- RAF SPORTS PARACHUTE (Working name)
- RAF SPORTS PARACHUTING (Working name)
- RAFSPA (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Patrick McGowan | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Michael Mooney | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.79k | £31.91k | £7.82k | £43.82k | £33.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.86k | £19.52k | £9.44k | £14.87k | £40.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 December 2020 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 December 2020 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTYÆS ARMED FORCES IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO: (A) INCREASING PHYSICAL FITNESS; (B) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS; (C) RAISING MORALE; OF MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE. IN PARTICULAR, (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION), THE TRUSTEES MAY FURTHER THE OBJECT THROUGH ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THE PARTICIPATION IN, AND PROVISION OF OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR, SPORTS PARACHUTING IN THE ROYAL AIR FORCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAF SPORTS PARACHUTE ASSOCIATION
HQ RAF SPORT
KERMODE HALL
RAF HALTON
AYLESBURY
HP22 5PG
- Phone:
- 01296796560
- Email:
- RAFSportsPara@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window