Accounts and annual returns COLCHESTER JAMIAH MASJID CIO

Charity number: 1183932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 July 2023 21 April 2025 334 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2023 21 April 2025 334 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 July 2022 20 April 2025 699 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2022 20 April 2025 699 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 July 2021 19 April 2025 1063 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2021 19 April 2025 1063 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 July 2020 07 June 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1441 days