COLCHESTER JAMIAH MASJID CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training for children and Adults and cultural activities Religious Activities: Regular prayers Other religious activities with accordance with sunnah
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 17 June 2019: CIO registration
- North East Essex Muslim Association (NEEMA) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Shamim Rashid | Chair | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shahin Rashid | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Faisal Kamal Ahmed | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mishba Uddin | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Koysor Chowdhury | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MD Nazrul Hoque Mustaque | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Umar Nuhu Ramadan | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Motin Miah | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mashukur Rahman | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/07/2020 | 22/07/2021 | 22/07/2022 | 22/07/2023 | 22/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £30 | £210 | £120 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 July 2023 | 21 April 2025 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 July 2023 | 21 April 2025 | 334 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 July 2022 | 20 April 2025 | 699 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 July 2022 | 20 April 2025 | 699 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 July 2021 | 19 April 2025 | 1063 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 July 2021 | 19 April 2025 | 1063 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1461 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO PEACEFULLY ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH QURAN AND SUNNAH WITHOUT GEOGRAPHIC RESTRICTION AND IN ALL ASPECTS INCLUDING EDUCATION AND RELIEF FROM POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Colchester Jamiah Mosque
2-3 Priory Street
COLCHESTER
CO1 2PY
- Phone:
- 07957135994
- Email:
- info@theneema.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window