UK NATIONAL PARKS CHARITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As per charitable objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Watson | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Winkworth | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Fiona Wynne | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sir Peter John Bellet Dixon | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Tegryn Jones | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.89k | £9.58k | £184.17k | £100.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £90.00k | £180.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Mar 2019 as amended on 12 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE AREAS DESIGNATED AS NATIONAL PARKS IN ENGLAND, WALES AND SCOTLAND, RECOGNISING AT ALL TIMES THE REQUIREMENT TO RESPECT THE SPECIAL QUALITIES OF THOSE DESIGNATED AREAS: 1.THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT OF NATURAL AND CULTURAL HERITAGE; 2.THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY: (A)THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; (B)THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF COMMUNITIES ACHIEVING RURAL ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; 3.THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE NATIONAL PARKS AND THEIR SPECIAL QUALITIES; 4.THE PROMOTION OF THE NATIONAL PARKS AS FACILITIES FOR APPROPRIATE RECREATION AND ENJOYMENT FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE; SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS”.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o BRECON BEACONS NATIONAL PARK
PLAS Y FFYNNON
CAMBRIAN WAY
ABERHONDDU
LD3 7HP
- Phone:
- 01874624437
- Email:
- enquiries@breconbeacons.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window