Financial history SUPPORT NEPAL UK

Charity number: 1181380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.75k £13.02k £9.22k £8.49k £5.14k
Total expenditure £6.88k £14.00k £8.47k £7.95k £3.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A