ARTS EDUCATION EXCHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts Education Exchange is a youth organisation based in Margate, East Kent. Our focus is to harness the potential of young people; to inspire social engagement through creative processes and to provide pathways to continued education, employment or work based training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 July 2019: CIO registration
- ARTS EDUCATION EXCHANGE CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracie Trimmer-Platman | Chair | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kane Robert McArthur | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paulo Moreira Gomes | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Barrow Williams | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lizo Ngqobongwana | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michele Buchanan | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.48k | £183.00k | £353.00k | £365.05k | £287.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.86k | £139.35k | £257.00k | £290.31k | £327.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £155.48k | £16.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 April 2023 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 April 2023 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 30YRS OLD, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, PARTICULARLY IN THE CREATIVE ARTS AND OTHER RELATED DISCIPLINES, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: 1. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 2. ADVANCING EDUCATION; 3. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT;
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Northdown Road
MARGATE
CT9 2RJ
- Phone:
- 01843316867
- Email:
- hello@artsedex.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window