THE SOMERTON LIBRARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates within the terms of a Community Partnership Agreement in partnership with Somerset County Council to provide a library service in Somerton for the public benefit open to all eligible members of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Peter Spencer Greenop OBE | Chair | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martyn George | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Stannett | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Partington | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Cherry | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Geoffrey Smith | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.79k | £52.99k | £24.18k | £20.29k | £29.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.38k | £23.65k | £32.27k | £30.74k | £43.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | £48.23k | £11.60k | £9.60k | £9.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2019 as amended on 28 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING THE OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY IN SOMERTON FOR THE BENEFIT OF LOCAL RESIDENTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LITTLE BARNS
THE TRIANGLE
SOMERTON
TA11 6ND
- Phone:
- 07580050425
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window