MS CENTRE DORSET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) To support and relieve people affected by multiple sclerosis in the Bournemouth and East Dorset area; (b) To encourage people affected by multiple sclerosis to attain their full potential as members of society by improving their conditions of life. We operate a centre in West Parley where people with multiple sclerosis can meet, exercise & socialise with each other.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
Governance
- 01 March 2019: CIO registration
- BOURNEMOUTH & DISTRICT MS COMMUNITY HUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Cerameed Neal | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Victoria Walker | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Irvine Osborough | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Patrick Hunt | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14k | £617 | £1.82k | £228.62k | £138.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £978 | £34.49k | £154.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2019 as amended on 11 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO SUPPORT AND RELIEVE PEOPLE AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, (B) TO ENCOURAGE PEOPLE AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS TO ATTAIN THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OSBORNE DAY CENTRE
CHURCH LANE
WEST PARLEY
FERNDOWN
DORSET
BH22 8TS
- Phone:
- 01202570300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window