Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD THE KING'S GLORY CHURCH

Charity number: 1182416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £70.26k £108.32k £142.89k £140.80k £217.46k
Total expenditure £27.45k £30.50k £58.42k £129.89k £192.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A