NONSUCH DULCIMER CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art, heritage and science of music as they relate to the hammered, plucked and mountain dulcimer families of musical instruments, primarily but not exclusively within the British Isles, through networking, public concerts, recitals, workshops, lectures, festivals, conferences, exhibitions and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- China
- France
- Germany
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 03 July 2019: CIO registration
- 12 June 2020: Funds received from 1157100 DULCIMER WORLD CONGRESS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE ANN FITT BA | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Low Cormie | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
William James Duddy | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Hudson | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH WHYTEHEAD | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.11k | £22.99k | £8.71k | £31.94k | £37.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.32k | £11.52k | £10.47k | £36.04k | £30.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, AND IN PARTICULAR AS THEY RELATE TO THE HAMMERED, PLUCKED AND MOUNTAIN DULCIMER FAMILIES OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS (INCLUDING INTERNATIONAL VARIANTS), PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE BRITISH ISLES AND BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, RECITALS, WORKSHOPS, LECTURES, FESTIVALS, CONFERENCES, EXHIBITIONS AND THE PROVISION OF GRANTS IN SUPPORT OF THESE AIMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 10
Holmwood House
6 Purshall Close
Redditch
B97 4PD
- Phone:
- 0152764229
- Email:
- contact@dulcimer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window