THE BORROWDALE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a hall for the leisure and education of residents and visitors to the valley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 January 2019: CIO registration
- 18 March 2019: Funds received from 223579 THE BORROWDALE INSTITUTE
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Dixon | Chair | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Margaret Julia Braithwaite | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Penelope Mary deZouche Cooke | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr Mark Radcliffe | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
John Postans | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Lewis Harrison | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Pamela Cooke | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Ralf Smits | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Craig Fearon | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Adrian Paye | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev Charles Henry Hope | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.31k | £250.87k | £103.90k | £33.69k | £73.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.00k | £179.36k | £222.67k | £58.88k | £56.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.64k | £13.68k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Jan 2019 as amended on 26 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BORROWDALE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE ‘AREA OF BENEFIT’) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Borrowdale Institute
Rosthwaite
KESWICK
CA12 5XB
- Phone:
- 01768777671
- Email:
- malcolmstonestreet@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window