Trustees SHIPLAKE MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 1182572

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Partridge | Chair | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Edward Macdiarmid | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Atkinson | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANN HUDGELL | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Ann Manning | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Manson | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE FAIRBROTHER | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.