SEACROFT FRIENDS AND NEIGHBOURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to support over 60's living in Seacroft, Leeds who are in need by reason of their age, ill health, disability financial hardship or other disadvantage. We provide practical help, information, advice and activities to enable people to maintain independence, health and social contacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £165,276 from 2 government contract(s) and £15,628 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Dann | Chair | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Scott | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheonagh Clarke | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hyde | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FIRTH | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Allen | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £446.96k | £284.29k | £245.43k | £244.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.97k | £224.69k | £198.83k | £218.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £165.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | £169.74k | £206.82k | £204.12k | £15.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 August 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 August 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS AGED 60 OR OVER WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE INCLUDING INFORMATION ADVICE AND SUPPORT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel FM Arts Centre
Old Seacroft Chapel
1081 York Road
LEEDS
LS14 6JB
- Phone:
- 01132734979
- Email:
- CAROL.NSGN@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window