Accounts and annual returns DIASPORA WOMAN FOR TRUTH, MEMORY AND RECONCILIATION OF COLOMBIAN WOMEN IN THE DIASPORA

Charity Number: 1184751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window