CHURCH KIRK REGENERATION TRUST

Charity number: 1185894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To conserve, repair and improve St James' Church, Church Kirk, Accrington and to develop its use as a site to advance education and to provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities, with the object of improving their conditions of life.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Stuart Eaves Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Cath Holmes Trustee 02 November 2021
HYNDBURN GREEN SPACES FORUM
Recently registered
Ian Garbett Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Graham Peter Jones Trustee 28 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £684 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £421 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 December 2024 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 December 2024 320 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 April 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 April 2022 63 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
45 Warmden Avenue
ACCRINGTON
Lancashire
BB5 2PR
Phone:
07812 076 753