THE IRON AND STEEL INDUSTRY TRAINING (WEST MIDLANDS) TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides training and education finance to support employees in companies in the metals industry in the United Kingdom, giving preference to metal industry employees in the West Midlands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 February 1983: Standard registration
- 04 September 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 September 2017: Funds transferred to 314211 THE CHARITY FUND OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF TIN ...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.87k | £5.87k | £2.72k | £639 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.26k | £147.23k | £140.94k | £47.40k | £26.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 29 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 31 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 30 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF ESTABLISHING, BUILDING, EQUIPPING, MANAGING, MEETING THE OPERATING COSTS OF AND SUPPORTING GENERALLY A TRAINING CENTRE IN THE WEST MIDLANDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING TRAINING FACILITIES FOR PERSONS EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN THE IRON AND STEEL INDUSTRY.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window