ANTIOCH NETWORK MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Antioch Network are to develop and sustain Christian Mission to support and strengthen the work and ministry of the Church of England in the Diocese of Manchester, by planting small churches in areas of social and economic deprivation and multicultural diversity. Service of worship, prayer, pastoral support and reaching out to those in need will be the main activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 04 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Donna Ann Williams | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emily Joy Gray | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Downs | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christie Spurling | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin Robert Woodfield | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN BRETT | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter John White | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev PHILIP JOHN RAWLINGS | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.76k | £140.10k | £188.46k | £294.35k | £254.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.18k | £110.55k | £206.97k | £241.16k | £233.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.81k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH/RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF MANCHESTER, THROUGH EDUCATION AND TRAINING, THE PLANTING OF SMALL CHURCHES, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John's House
155-163 The Rock
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 0ND
- Phone:
- 07810301566
- Email:
- antiochnetworkmcr@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window