SETTLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Settled is a new charity (registered number: 1184580), working with vulnerable and hard to reach EU / EEA citizens in the UK. Settled is registered Level 3 Immigration Limited to EU Settlement Scheme by the Immigration Services Commissioner (registration no. Settled CIO N201900057). Our mission is to outreach to those who are at risk of losing their right to live and work in the UK after Brexit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £180,358 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martine Alice Petetin | Chair | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maurizio Campolo | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Graham | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malin Hesslefors Nairn | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eszter Molnar-Mills | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andre Henri Francois Nieuwenhuis | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wiard Marius Albert Sterk | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER LAWRENCE DESIRA | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.32k | £229.91k | £329.57k | £420.54k | £495.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.40k | £207.94k | £324.38k | £414.73k | £495.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £92.69k | £43.68k | £76.97k | £50.00k | £180.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jul 2019 as amended on 29 Nov 2022 as amended on 11 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF EUROPEAN UNION CITIZENS* IN NEED, BY REASON OF WAR, CONFLICT, YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, HOMELESSNESS, BEING VICTIMS/SURVIVORS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, BEING VICTIMS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, INFORMATION, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND REPRESENTATION. *FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, EUROPEAN CITIZENS INCLUDE CITIZENS AND RESIDENTS OF ALL EU COUNTRIES OR EEA OR SWISS NATIONALS, OR NATIONALS OF PROSPECTIVE CANDIDATES OR CANDIDATE COUNTRIES TO THE EUROPEAN UNION, OR NON-EUROPEAN UNION CITIZENS DEPENDENT ON AN EUROPEAN UNION CITIZEN FOR THEIR CURRENT RESIDENCE STATUS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 13 - 15
Platform
Bute Street
Cardiff
CF10 5LS
- Phone:
- 03302235336
- Email:
- info@settled.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window