Accounts and annual returns HELPING OUR HOMELESS WALES

Charity Number: 1183417
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 April 2025 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 April 2025 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 September 2024 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 January 2025 337 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 July 2023 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 July 2023 152 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window