Financial history HELPING OUR HOMELESS WALES

Charity Number: 1183417
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.59k £54.00k £129.50k £141.61k £126.53k
Total expenditure £15.74k £21.00k £16.82k £128.97k £131.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.53k £21.96k £29.29k