LAWRENCE CLOISTERS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation, restoration, maintenance, repair and improvement of the Cloisters, a grade II* listed building on the 'At Risk' register of Historic England, situated in Barrington Road, Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire. The provision and assisting in the provision of tours and educational events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,520 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
judith lindsey gower | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Allison Deborah Lane | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frank Freeman | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Keith Golds | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Davis | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paramjit Singh Dev | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Dunstan King | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.35k | £166.82k | £205.31k | £229.42k | £202.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.89k | £124.94k | £187.45k | £227.92k | £206.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £96.57k | £32.56k | £500 | £12.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 FEB 1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, RESTORE, MAINTAIN, AND ENHANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE HISTORIC STRUCTURE THE CLOISTERS, A GRADE II LISTED BUILDING, SITUATED IN BARRINGTON ROAD, LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY, HERTFORDSHIRE, SG6 3TH. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORY OF THE HISTORIC STRUCTURE OF THE CLOISTERS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TOURS AND EDUCATIONAL EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cloisters
Barrington Road
Letchworth Garden City
Hertfordshire
SG6 3TH
- Phone:
- 01462678059
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window