KROLL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Kroll Charitable Foundation (UK) works closely with Duff & Phelps colleagues to recommend grants and volunteerism with organizations that: 1) Promote financial literacy and opportunity, 2) Support diversity, 3) address critical needs or disaster response in Duff & Phelps employment centers. The foundation is funded by the employees, management and partners of Duff & Phelps globally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 October 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jersey
- Luxembourg
- Netherlands
- Portugal
- Spain
Governance
- 04 October 2019: CIO registration
- 26 May 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 26 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1135192 THE MUSTARD TREE
- DUFF & PHELPS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 03/10/2021 | 03/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.01k | £0 | £30 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | £387 | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 October 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 03 October 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 86 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 November 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 November 2021 | 19 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2019 as amended on 19 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO REGISTERED, EXCEPTED AND EXEMPT CHARITIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window