INTERESTELAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Interestelar promotes voluntary work among health professionals. Health Professionals can develop their own initiatives to promote good health habits and provide health education to the general population in any part of the world. We intend to fund raise money with the ultimate goal of setting up a respite centre, not only for patients with severe chronic illnesses but also for their carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £33,845 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Spain
Governance
- 18 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Cristina Lopez Peig | Chair | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olatz Begona Heredia Diez | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jose Luis Montes Buera | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vidaltxo Martinez Elizari | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/03/2020 | 20/03/2021 | 20/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £2.52k | £4.68k | £33.87k | £33.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43 | £79 | £618 | £8.21k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BUT ALSO THE HEALTH OF THEIR CARERS AND GENERAL PUBLIC IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING EDUCATION RELATED TO HEALTH PROMOTION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, BOOKS, LEAFLETS AND THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS AND BY RAISING AWARENESS AND ORGANISING ACTIVITIES TO SUPPORT THE COMMUNITY STRUCTURES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHICH HAVE A PROVEN BENEFICIAL EFFECT IN GENERAL HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 BLACKWELL CLOSE
LONDON
N21 1UL
- Phone:
- 07971871858
- Email:
- interestelar.es@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window