Oxhaven Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Focus on poverty, health, social inclusion; providing grants to nominees of agencies or charities particularly in Oxfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 April 2019: Standard registration
- 01 August 2024: Funds received from 1182826 TWO COATS TRUST
- BRIGHT FAMILY CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob Bright | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Bright | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bright | Trustee | 19 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor SUSAN BRIGHT | Trustee | 19 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85k | £424.06k | £417.62k | £998.85k | £76.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £19.19k | £8.77k | £58.31k | £60.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £965.48k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.37k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £47.29k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 DEC 2018 as amended on 17 Mar 2020 as amended on 17 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH INCLUDING THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISEASE OR HUMAN SUFFERING, AS WELL AS THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO EASE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED OR INFIRM OR TO PROVIDE COMFORTS FOR PATIENTS 3. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY. 4. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT 5. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105A LONSDALE ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 7ET
- Phone:
- 01865308125
- Email:
- tbfc@oxhold.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window