DOGS.N.HOMES RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public in Fleet and surrounding North Hampshire, Surrey and Berkshire areas, our mission is to help find the perfect dog for anyone wanting to adopt a rescue dog in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Portugal
- Romania
Governance
- 07 June 2019: CIO registration
- 18 October 2023: Funds received from 1201131 REVIVE UKRAINE
- DogsnHomes Rescue (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Edward Walter Crumpton | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gitte Rasmussen | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE STEVENSON | Trustee | 27 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE BALLARD | Trustee | 28 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.98k | £137.42k | £174.56k | £205.38k | £146.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.15k | £85.39k | £108.24k | £145.90k | £145.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO FIND THEM NEW HOMES, OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DOGS IN PARTICULAR TO THOSE BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE UK AND EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Sandy Lane
Church Crookham
FLEET
GU52 8LA
- Phone:
- 07800555863
- Email:
- gary@dogsnhomes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window