BECAUSE YOUR LIFE COUNTS

Charity Number: 1184367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a locally based charity that aims to provide education and information to young people and the general public. We do this by providing presentations on road safety at local schools and events. These sessions often use modern technology such as VR headsets/Simulators to make the sessions interactive. We also provide funding to which allow young people to participate in road safety courses.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £40
Total expenditure: £1,276

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Leicester City
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Warwickshire
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 July 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Glenn Hartwell Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Raymond Leonard Sheaf Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Darryn Majury Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
JOSHPREET SINGH SANDHU Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £6.10k £5.50k £627 £127 £40
Total expenditure £2.81k £4.10k £697 £709 £1.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 26 July 2024 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 26 July 2024 176 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 28 February 2023 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 02 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 02 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 WHEELWRIGHT BUILDINGS
4 WHEELWRIGHT BUILDINGS
HEN LANE
COVENTRY
CV6 4LB
Phone:
08001182001
Website:

bylc.co.uk