WEST HALLAM CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide premises for the use of members of the village and surrounding area of West Hallam.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 31 October 1983: Standard registration
- WEST HALLAM COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ROGER GREEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew James Hitchcock | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE RUTH STOREY | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES RICHARD BROOKS | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER IAN HARTSHORN | Trustee | 09 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVE THACKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE GRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IVOR PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE JAMISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.90k | £23.11k | £26.77k | £22.57k | £138.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.19k | £16.31k | £25.64k | £34.24k | £33.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.62k | £9.67k | £2.23k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME N228(S) OF 7 OCTOBER 1982 82.
Charitable objects
(A) PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WEST HALLAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS O LIFE, (B) PROVISION OF A YOUTH CENTRE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF UNDER 25 RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
WEST HALLAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Station Rd
West Hallam
Derbyshire
DE7 6GX
- Phone:
- 07796908189
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window