Accounts and annual returns The Pempamsie Foundation
Charity number: 1182602

Charity reporting is overdue by 1343 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 247 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 247 days | |
Annual return | 27 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 613 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 613 days | |
Annual return | 27 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 978 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 978 days | |
Annual return | 27 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1343 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1343 days | |
Annual return | 27 October 2019 | 24 January 2021 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2019 | 24 January 2021 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window