THE BURNLEY AND DISTRICT HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A series of lectures during the winter. Visits to places of Historical interest. The publication of local history books. To help people with historical research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 January 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE NORTH | Chair | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HALL MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN MARTIN CHILD BA ALA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £719 | £206 | £778 | £1.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.37k | £968 | £381 | £1.98k | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 21 JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 1982.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF BURNLEY AND DISTRICT BY MEANS OF EXCAVATIONS, DISCOVERY OF ANTIQUITIES, HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, PUBLICATION OF WORKS AND THE PROMOTION AND ASSISTANCE OF STUDENTS ENGAGED IN RELEVANT STUDIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 LANGDALE ROAD
BLACKBURN
BB2 5DW
- Phone:
- 07990905687
- Email:
- martinchild66@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window