Financial history URBOND

Charity number: 1184273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £32.25k £199.93k £190.55k £322.72k £398.37k
Total expenditure £16.33k £102.94k £210.38k £320.23k £330.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.07k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £146.35k N/A £46.98k £37.45k