BABBACOMBE CLIFF RAILWAY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The day to day running of a funicular railway built in 1926
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 04 March 2019: CIO registration
- BABBACOMBE CLIFF RAILWAY COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay John Yelland | Chair | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Robert David Newman | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|||||||
Judith Norma Ayres | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
David Alan Cooper FCIBSE | Trustee | 01 August 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.88k | £195.77k | £368.76k | £308.36k | £143.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.94k | £203.46k | £229.13k | £221.36k | £467.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE, MAINTAIN, AND OPERATE THE HISTORIC BABBACOMBE CLIFF RAILWAY ("THE RAILWAY") AND ITS ASSOCIATED ROLLING STOCK, BUILDINGS AND INFRASTRUCTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ENSURE THAT THE RAILWAY CONTINUES TO OPERATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND VISITORS TO TORBAY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Babbacombe Cliff Railway
Babbacombe Downs Road
TORQUAY
TQ1 3LF
- Phone:
- 01803328750
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window