WHERE I WANT TO LIVE

Charity Number: 1187240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Where I want to Live is a national charity that will provide a toolkit to enable users to gain a true understanding of their ambitions with regards future living options. The toolkit will also define the living options and provide signposting to resources. The signposting will facilitate understanding so that all beneficiaries are able to be involved in planning future living arrangements.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £20,320
Total expenditure: £19,838

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERTO MORELLI Chair 10 December 2019
None on record
NEIL HOWELL BEVAN Trustee 16 July 2021
None on record
GRAEME PETER CARD Trustee 15 December 2020
HUGHENDEN VALLEY VILLAGE HALL AND KING GEORGE'S FIELD
Received: On time
SOUTH BUCKS DOWN'S SYNDROME GROUP
Received: On time
Ian Anthony Burman Trustee 10 December 2019
THE BRENDON HILLS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HOCHHAUSER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CITY RUGBY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE WOOSNAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TUTOR THE NATION
Received: On time
H AND M CASTANG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
RECYCLING OF USED PLASTICS LIMITED
Received: On time
SEA SANCTUARIES TRUST
Received: On time
The Lord Leonard and Lady Estelle Wolfson Foundation
Received: On time
M D C JENKS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Louise Keevil Trustee 10 December 2019
THE GORDON RUSSELL TRUST
Received: On time
Dr ALI TOUTOUNCHI Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.00k £1.57k £18.71k £6.11k £20.32k
Total expenditure £2.17k £6.49k £20.07k £12.16k £19.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.46k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Laytons Solicitors
2 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AP
Phone:
02078428000