Financial history FREE REPRESENTATION UNIT

Charity number: 1183592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £206.43k £496.71k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £204.86k £505.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A