SIERRA LEONE DIABETES EDUCATION AND TREATMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising events to raise Diabetes Awareness, Cardio-vascular conditions and prevention of both through education in predominantly Afro-Caribbean and Asian Communities in the United Kingdom and in communities in Sierra Leone To organise workshops, road shows, Diabetes and Cardio-vascular screening events including out reach work in disadvantaged communities in both the UK and Sierra Leone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 04 February 2020: Standard registration
- SLEDETA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH CONTEH REGISTERED NURSE | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|||||
AMY NYALAY DE VERIES BA HONS | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SULAIMAN ROGERS | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESS KADIE BOI-TINGIN FODE | Trustee | 25 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25 | £100 | £900 | £300 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £607 | £1.86k | £816 | £500 | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2022 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE AT RISK OF OR WHO HAVE DIABETES AND CARDIO-VASCULAR CONDITIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN RURAL AREAS IN SIERRA LEONE WHO HAVE POOR AND NEEDY SECTORS OF COMMUNITIES WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE COSTS OF HEALTHCARE BY THE PROVISION OF: A)OUTREACH PROGRAMS FOCUSED ON THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT, REHABILITATION AND SUPPORT FOR ALL IMPACTED BY DIABETES AND CARDIO-VASCULAR CONDITIONS IN SIERRA LEONE B)TO RAISE AWARENESS OF DIABETES AND CARDIOVASCULAR CONDITIONS, PREVENTION THROUGH EDUCATION TO PEOPLE SUFFERING WITH OR AT RISK OF DEVELOPING THESE CONDITIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AFRO-CARIBBEAN AND ASIAN COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY ORGANISING WORKSHOPS, ROAD SHOWS, AWARENESS EVENTS INCLUDING OUTREACH WORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Curlew Close
LONDON
SE28 8HT
- Phone:
- +447904212704
- Email:
- SLEDETA@YAHOO.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window