AVA MARIE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING MEMORY BOX TO PARENTS AND FAMILIES WHO HAVE WHO HAVE LOST A CHILD WHETHER THROUGH NEONATAL DEATH, STILLBIRTH, MISCARRIAGE OR MEDICAL TERMINATION OR WHO ARE PREGNANT WITH A CHILD WITH A LIFE LIMITING CONDITION AND BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEURO TUBE DEFECT, ANENCEPHALY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 June 2019: CIO registration
- (THE) AVA MARIE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Thompson | Chair | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Peter Thompson | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Cain | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Benjamin Lockett | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shannon Hill | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Will | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.70k | £11.04k | £21.69k | £41.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.68k | £11.05k | £19.30k | £39.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | £7.29k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 March 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 March 2023 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING MEMORY BOX TO PARENTS AND FAMILIES WHO HAVE WHO HAVE LOST A CHILD WHETHER THROUGH NEONATAL DEATH, STILLBIRTH, MISCARRIAGE OR MEDICAL TERMINATION OR WHO ARE PREGNANT WITH A CHILD WITH A LIFE LIMITING CONDITION AND BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEURO TUBE DEFECT, ANENCEPHALY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
Child Bereavement Hub
13-15 Market Street
Newton-le-Willows
Merseyside
WA12 9BQ
- Phone:
- 01925299368
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window