Accounts and annual returns TRISTAN'S PAWPRINTS

Charity number: 1184435
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 April 2025 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 January 2025 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 April 2025 434 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days