TASTED

Charity Number: 1183753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide curriculum and training in Taste Education to schools and nurseries. The aim of TastEd lessons are to give children positive exposure to vegetables and fruits and to give teachers a simple and effective tool for delivering food education. The long term goal is to help children know, try and enjoy healthy food.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £7,319
Total expenditure: £62,222

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 June 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Jane Lockie Chair 30 April 2020
None on record
Jessica Seren Grace Lea-Wilson Trustee 08 December 2023
None on record
Flora Ellen May Donovan Trustee 08 December 2023
None on record
Dr John Lee Trustee 08 December 2023
None on record
Joolz Felix Foster Trustee 08 December 2023
None on record
Kim Smith Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Jason O'Rourke Trustee 31 December 2018
THE DODDINGTON HALL CONSERVATION CHARITY
Received: On time
BEE WILSON Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £55.60k £44.52k £124.92k £49.94k £7.32k
Total expenditure £41.99k £23.42k £24.71k £43.29k £62.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £4.10k £3.45k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Dovecote Lane
Coleby
Lincoln
LN5 0AD
Phone:
01223309588
Website:

tasteeducation.com